Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/01/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/03/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/03/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/03/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/08/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/08/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/10/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/10/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/23/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/23/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/23/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/23/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/23/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/23/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/25/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/07/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/13/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/13/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/13/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/21/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/11/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/11/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/11/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/11/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/06/2002