Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/17/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/12/2001