Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/26/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/26/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/26/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/26/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/02/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/02/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/02/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/02/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/21/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/21/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/21/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/21/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/14/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/27/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/28/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/24/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/24/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/24/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/24/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/24/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/24/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/24/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/24/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/24/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/01/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 08/01/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 08/01/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/02/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/09/2002