Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/16/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/16/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/16/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/16/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/16/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/16/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/16/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/16/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/16/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/16/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/16/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/16/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/16/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/16/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/16/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/16/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/05/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2002