Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/08/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/08/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/15/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/11/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/18/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/13/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/13/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/27/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 12/04/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/06/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/19/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/14/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/05/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/19/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/15/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/06/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/14/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/15/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/25/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew