Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/26/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/26/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/03/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/03/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/15/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/15/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/22/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/12/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/25/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/16/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/07/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/06/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/06/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/14/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/14/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/26/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/26/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/26/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/13/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/22/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/17/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/17/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/02/2002