Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/21/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/21/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/21/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/21/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/21/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/21/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/21/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 12/19/2001