Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/25/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/25/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/25/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/25/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/25/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 04/25/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/08/2001