Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/02/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/24/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/13/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/13/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/10/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/09/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/17/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/08/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/16/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/04/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/13/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/17/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 06/17/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/26/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/08/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/15/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/22/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/23/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/04/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/09/2002