Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/25/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/25/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/25/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/02/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/02/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/02/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/02/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/09/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/16/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/16/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/16/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/16/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/22/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/06/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/06/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/13/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/26/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/11/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/11/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/18/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002