Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/24/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/24/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/26/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/03/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/09/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/25/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/20/2002