Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/24/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/27/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/23/2001