Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/01/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/15/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/21/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/21/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/13/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/24/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/18/2002