Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/01/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/15/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/14/2002