Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/25/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 04/25/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/25/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/26/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/02/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/02/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/03/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/03/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/03/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/09/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/16/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/23/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/23/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/18/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/18/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/25/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/25/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/25/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/06/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/14/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/23/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/19/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/19/2002