Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/25/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/25/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/25/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/25/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/25/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/07/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/07/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/07/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/09/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/09/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/17/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/21/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/25/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 06/27/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/30/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/30/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/30/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/30/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/20/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/04/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/29/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/19/2002