Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/08/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/02/2001