Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/01/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/01/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/01/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/01/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/22/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/22/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/22/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/12/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/20/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/28/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/24/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/24/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/24/2001