Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/21/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/05/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/21/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/08/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/24/2002