Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/17/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/10/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/21/2002