Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/20/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/18/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/12/2002