Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/01/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/08/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/08/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/17/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/17/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/17/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/22/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/22/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/22/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/12/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/12/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/12/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/26/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/26/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/26/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/06/2001