Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/25/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/25/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/26/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/26/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/27/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/27/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/27/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/01/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/01/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/02/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/07/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/09/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/10/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/16/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/21/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/19/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/04/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/17/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/20/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/15/2002