Committees: H.R.1542 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/24/2001 Referred to
04/25/2001 Hearings by
05/09/2001 Markup by
05/24/2001 Reported by House Report 107-83,Part 1
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications and the Internet04/26/2001 Referred to
04/26/2001 Markup by
04/26/2001 Reported by
House Judiciary05/24/2001 Referred to
06/05/2001 Hearings by
06/13/2001 Markup by
06/18/2001 Reported by House Report 107-83,Part 2
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation02/28/2002 Referred to