Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/10/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/23/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/13/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/13/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/13/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/13/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/13/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/19/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/11/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/18/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/12/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/11/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/30/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/07/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/24/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/02/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/02/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/11/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/10/2002