Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/14/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/15/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/14/2002