Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/24/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/25/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/25/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/02/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/03/2001