Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/25/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/25/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/27/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/27/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/09/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/28/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/20/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/12/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/26/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/19/2002
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/09/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/17/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/17/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/17/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/23/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/30/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/01/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/07/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/08/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/09/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/20/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/25/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/27/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/18/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/18/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/09/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/16/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 11/12/2002