Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/10/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/10/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/12/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/26/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/05/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/11/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/11/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/12/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/23/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/14/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/19/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/05/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/23/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/12/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/14/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/26/2002