Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/07/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/07/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/07/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/07/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/07/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/07/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/07/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/07/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/07/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/07/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/07/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/17/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/17/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/17/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/17/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/23/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/14/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/14/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/02/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/20/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/16/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 12/18/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/28/2002