Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/06/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/14/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/14/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/08/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/08/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/27/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/27/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/07/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/20/2002