Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/25/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/25/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/03/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/25/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/27/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/17/2001