There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide a special rule for members of the uniformed services and the Foreign Service, and other employees, in determining the exclusion of gain from the sale of a principal residence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/26/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/26/2001Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/17/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/17/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/24/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/24/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/24/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/24/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/07/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/26/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/26/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/08/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/23/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/23/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/23/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/21/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/09/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/26/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1596.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1596. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/26/2001)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to suspend, for purposes of determining exclusion of gain from the sale of a principal residence, the five-year determination period for: (1) members of the uniformed services or the Foreign Service serving on qualified extended duty (at least 50 miles from such residence or residing in Government quarters); or (2) an employee serving for more than 90 days on assignment abroad.