Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/17/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/17/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/24/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/24/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/24/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/24/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/07/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/26/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/26/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/08/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/23/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/23/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/23/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/21/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/09/2002