Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/26/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/26/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 04/26/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/03/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/03/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/03/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/10/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/10/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/10/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/17/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/17/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/25/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/07/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/07/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/07/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/27/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/16/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/18/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/18/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/18/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/18/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/16/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/25/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/25/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/25/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/02/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/02/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/09/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/23/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/23/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/06/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/13/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/24/2002