Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/09/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/15/2002