Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/17/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/17/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/14/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/10/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/10/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/23/2002