Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/02/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/02/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/02/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/09/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/09/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/09/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/09/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/22/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/05/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/07/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/08/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/21/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/26/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/10/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/10/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/17/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/17/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/19/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/19/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/23/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/23/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/23/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/23/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/24/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/31/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/31/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/31/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/31/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/31/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 08/01/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/01/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/01/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/01/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/05/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/05/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/05/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/13/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/13/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/13/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/13/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/13/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/21/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/25/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/03/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/05/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/05/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/10/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/11/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 11/06/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/29/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 12/19/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 01/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/29/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/13/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/27/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/27/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/04/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/05/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/05/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/07/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/19/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/10/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/23/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/24/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/24/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/25/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/22/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/23/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/12/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/18/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/24/2002