Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/03/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/30/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/13/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/14/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/13/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/13/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/13/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/14/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/14/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/21/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/21/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/21/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/21/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/21/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/21/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/28/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/28/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/28/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/28/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/03/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/03/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/03/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/03/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/03/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/01/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/01/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/01/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/01/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/01/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/22/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/22/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/22/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/24/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/07/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/07/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/07/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/13/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/13/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/13/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/13/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/13/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/13/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/21/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/10/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/26/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/20/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/20/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/20/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/04/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/05/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/05/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/10/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/11/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/11/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/12/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/01/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/07/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/07/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/13/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/13/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/13/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/14/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/14/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/14/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/14/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/14/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/14/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/14/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/14/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/14/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/19/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/19/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/28/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/28/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/28/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/28/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/11/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew