Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/12/2002