Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/16/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/16/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/16/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/21/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/23/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/23/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/23/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/25/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/25/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/25/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/25/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/25/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/07/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/07/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/20/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/20/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/20/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/20/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/20/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/23/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/14/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/14/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/19/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/19/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/29/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 12/11/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/09/2002