Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/22/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/25/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/28/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/17/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/30/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/06/2002