Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/02/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/03/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/03/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/03/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/08/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/09/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/09/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/14/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/14/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/14/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/14/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/14/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/14/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/14/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/14/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/14/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/14/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/14/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/14/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/14/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/14/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/14/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/14/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/16/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/16/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/16/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/17/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/22/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/22/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/22/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/22/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/23/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/23/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/23/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/23/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/24/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/05/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/06/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/06/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/07/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/21/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/25/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/26/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/26/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/27/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/10/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/11/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/11/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/20/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/27/2001