There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to designate certified diabetes educators recognized by the National Certification Board of Diabetes Educators as certified providers for purposes of outpatient diabetes education services under part B of the Medicare Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/26/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
05/08/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/03/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/26/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/15/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/15/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/15/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/15/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/15/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/24/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/25/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/25/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/13/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/20/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/27/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/27/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/27/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/12/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/12/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/17/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/17/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/27/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/27/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/31/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/05/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/05/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/05/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/13/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/13/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/14/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/14/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/20/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/28/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/11/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/11/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/11/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/31/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/31/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 12/20/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/06/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/28/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/26/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/26/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/08/2001 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/26/2001 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/03/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1645.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1645. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/26/2001)

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to provide for the treatment of certified diabetes educators recognized by the National Certification Board of Diabetes Educators as certified providers for purposes of outpatient diabetes education services under part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act.