Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/15/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/15/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/15/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/15/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/15/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/24/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/25/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/25/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/13/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/20/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/27/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/27/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/27/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/12/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/12/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/17/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/17/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/27/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/27/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/31/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/05/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/05/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/05/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/13/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/13/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/14/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/14/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/20/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/28/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/11/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/11/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/11/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/31/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/31/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 12/20/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/06/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/28/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/26/2002