Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/16/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/21/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/21/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/25/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/26/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/17/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/17/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/18/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/19/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 11/27/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/08/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/22/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/18/2002