Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/02/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/17/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/17/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/17/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/22/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/13/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/06/2002