Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
11/05/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-62.
11/05/2001 Signed by President.
10/25/2001 Presented to President.
10/17/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10798-10799)
10/01/2001 Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 107-77.
06/25/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3472)
05/01/2001 Introduced in House