Committees: H.R.1668 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources05/01/2001 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands05/09/2001 Referred to
06/19/2001 Reported by
06/19/2001 Markup by
06/12/2001 Hearings by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/12/2001 Referred to
10/01/2001 Reported by S. Rept. 107-77
07/17/2001 Hearings by
08/02/2001 Markup by