Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/01/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/25/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/25/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/12/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 08/02/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/10/2001